THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:11:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1151 Richmond Street
Schulich School of Medicine & Dentistry
Postgraduate Medical Education
Rm H131 Health Sciences Addition
London Ontario N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-661-2019
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1151 Richmond Street
Schulich School of Medicine & Dentistry
Postgraduate Medical Education
Rm H131 Health Sciences Addition
London Ontario N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-661-2019
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XINXIN TANG shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. TANG is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. TANG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TANG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. TANG shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. TANG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. TANG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XINXIN TANG shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. TANG is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. TANG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TANG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. TANG shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. TANG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. TANG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021