THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:42:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main St W
HSC 2V5
Hamilton ON L8S 4M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9022231796
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main St W
HSC 2V5
Hamilton ON L8S 4M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9022231796
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY ROSE CHISHOLM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHISHOLM is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. CHISHOLM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHISHOLM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CHISHOLM shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHISHOLM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHISHOLM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY ROSE CHISHOLM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHISHOLM is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. CHISHOLM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHISHOLM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CHISHOLM shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHISHOLM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHISHOLM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
15 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 14 Feb 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
15 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2023 to 14 Feb 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 15 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 14 Feb 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 15 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 14 Feb 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021