THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:45:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa St
Hamilton ON L8W 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-71 Speers Rd
Oakville ON L6K 0J2
Phone: 2897960052
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa St
Hamilton ON L8W 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-71 Speers Rd
Oakville ON L6K 0J2
Phone: 2897960052
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANEEN MOYASSAR YAHYA AL-MALLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-MALLAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANEEN MOYASSAR YAHYA AL-MALLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-MALLAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Aug 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021