Medical School:
Ross University School of Medicine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology |
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology |
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology |
14 Oct 2021 to 30 Jun 2022 |
McMaster University |
AVP - Anatomical Pathology |
01 Jul 2021 to 13 Oct 2021 |
McMaster University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
DATE:
14 Oct 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
DATE:
01 Jul 2021 to 13 Oct 2021
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University