THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:34:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZOE CHRISTINE PHILLIPS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PHILLIPS is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. PHILLIPS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PHILLIPS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PHILLIPS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PHILLIPS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PHILLIPS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZOE CHRISTINE PHILLIPS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PHILLIPS is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. PHILLIPS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PHILLIPS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PHILLIPS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PHILLIPS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PHILLIPS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
10 Apr 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
01 Jul 2025 to 09 Apr 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
05 May 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
10 Apr 2025 to 04 May 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 09 Apr 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
10 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 09 Apr 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
10 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 09 Apr 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
DATE: 10 Apr 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 09 Apr 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
DATE: 05 May 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 10 Apr 2025 to 04 May 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 09 Apr 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 10 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 09 Apr 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 10 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 09 Apr 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021