THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:51:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 66 Gerrard Street East
Hassel Free Clinic
Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M5B 2M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 922-0566
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 26 Dalhousie Street
Safer Six
Toronto Ontario M5B 2A5
Phone: (647) 657-4033
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1883 Turner Road
Aegis Medical
Windsor Ontario N8W 3K2
Phone: (226) 756-2127
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 66 Gerrard Street East
Hassel Free Clinic
Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M5B 2M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 922-0566
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 26 Dalhousie Street
Safer Six
Toronto Ontario M5B 2A5
Phone: (647) 657-4033
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1883 Turner Road
Aegis Medical
Windsor Ontario N8W 3K2
Phone: (226) 756-2127
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAREK JAMES JOHN COLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAREK JAMES JOHN COLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021