THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:08:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 212 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 0A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-347-7294
Fax: 416-287-9517
Address: 405-2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Phone: 1-866-611-7642
Fax: 647-670-0409
Address: 100-801 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1G1
Phone: 1-866-611-7642
Fax: 647-670-0409

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 212 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 0A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-347-7294
Fax: 416-287-9517
Address: 405-2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Phone: 1-866-611-7642
Fax: 647-670-0409
Address: 100-801 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1G1
Phone: 1-866-611-7642
Fax: 647-670-0409

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABIR FAYAD ISLAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISLAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABIR FAYAD ISLAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISLAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021