THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:00:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medicine UHN
Eaton Building 14-217
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medicine UHN
Eaton Building 14-217
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS ARAKI HOWELL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HOWELL is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. HOWELL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HOWELL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. HOWELL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HOWELL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HOWELL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS ARAKI HOWELL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HOWELL is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. HOWELL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HOWELL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. HOWELL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HOWELL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HOWELL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
29 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 28 Jul 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
30 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 29 Jul 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
30 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 29 Jul 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
DATE: 29 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 28 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 30 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 29 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 30 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 29 Jul 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021