THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:11:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 737-5182
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 737-5182
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KALYNA ERYN KRYWORUCHKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRYWORUCHKO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KALYNA ERYN KRYWORUCHKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRYWORUCHKO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Sep 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2021