THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:27:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
SHN - General Hospital
Dept. of Emergency Medicine
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-438-2911
Extension: 86300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Drive
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Dept. of Emergency Medicine
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
SHN - Birchmount Hospital
Dept. of Emergency Medicine
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: 416-495-2400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
SHN - Centenary Hospital
Dept. of Emergency Medicine
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Queen's University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
SHN - General Hospital
Dept. of Emergency Medicine
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-438-2911
Extension: 86300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Drive
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Dept. of Emergency Medicine
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
SHN - Birchmount Hospital
Dept. of Emergency Medicine
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: 416-495-2400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
SHN - Centenary Hospital
Dept. of Emergency Medicine
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN HUYNH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUYNH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN HUYNH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUYNH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021