THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:57:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Stokes St
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 535 8501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164806100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 9X4
Phone: (905) 430-4055
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Nursing Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Nursing
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Stokes St
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 535 8501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164806100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 9X4
Phone: (905) 430-4055
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Nursing Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Nursing
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA ANASTASIA MORRA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MORRA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MORRA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MORRA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MORRA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MORRA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MORRA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA ANASTASIA MORRA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MORRA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MORRA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MORRA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MORRA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MORRA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MORRA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021