THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:00:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
30 Aug 2024
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 30 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. WID YASEEN shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. YASEEN is enrolled at the University of Toronto.

(2) In Dr. YASEEN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. YASEEN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. YASEEN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. YASEEN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. YASEEN shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. YASEEN may practise internal medicine and to the extent of her employment at Toronto Health Sciences Network, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. YASEEN’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. YASEEN may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. YASEEN must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. YASEEN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. YASEEN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. YASEEN must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. YASEEN’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. YASEEN’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. YASEEN to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. YASEEN’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. YASEEN takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. YASEEN may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. YASEEN applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. WID YASEEN shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. YASEEN is enrolled at the University of Toronto.

(2) In Dr. YASEEN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. YASEEN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. YASEEN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. YASEEN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. YASEEN shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. YASEEN may practise internal medicine and to the extent of her employment at Toronto Health Sciences Network, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. YASEEN’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. YASEEN may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. YASEEN must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. YASEEN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. YASEEN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. YASEEN must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. YASEEN’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. YASEEN’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. YASEEN to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. YASEEN’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. YASEEN takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. YASEEN may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. YASEEN applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021