THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:57:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's Hospital Medical School, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Parkview Rd
West Haldimand General Hospital
Emergency Department
Hagersville ON N0A 1H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 768 3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's Hospital Medical School, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Parkview Rd
West Haldimand General Hospital
Emergency Department
Hagersville ON N0A 1H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 768 3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAROON ALAM MIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAROON ALAM MIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's Hospital Medical School, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021