THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:51:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa Ontario K2J 5V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (343) 644-9877
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3V4
Phone: (613) 686-3378
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 179 Clarence Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1B3
Phone: 613 234-4641
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa Ontario K2J 5V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (343) 644-9877
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3V4
Phone: (613) 686-3378
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 179 Clarence Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1B3
Phone: 613 234-4641
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSE ELIZABETH MARSHALL-SHEPPARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL-SHEPPARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSE ELIZABETH MARSHALL-SHEPPARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL-SHEPPARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021