THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:40:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Campbell Dr
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
Emergency Department
Uxbridge ON L9P 1R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 852-9771
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Campbell Dr
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
Emergency Department
Uxbridge ON L9P 1R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 852-9771
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN ROBERT FENN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FENN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN ROBERT FENN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FENN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021