Medical School:
McMaster University, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology |
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
Northern Ontario School of Medicine |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Northern Ontario School of Medicine |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
Northern Ontario School of Medicine |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology |
29 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
Northern Ontario School of Medicine |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2022 to 28 Aug 2022 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE:
29 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 28 Aug 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto