THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:26:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: Jayawardena, Sanasi Mariam (Used Until: 31 Mar 2022)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Extension: 33016
Fax: 905-788-0046
Address: 2 Fielden Avenue
Northland Pointe
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 4S9
Phone: (905) 835-9335
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

General Information

Former Name: Jayawardena, Sanasi Mariam (Used Until: 31 Mar 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Extension: 33016
Fax: 905-788-0046
Address: 2 Fielden Avenue
Northland Pointe
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 4S9
Phone: (905) 835-9335
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANASI MARIAM SWATSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWATSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANASI MARIAM SWATSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWATSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021