THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:21:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1475 Upper Ottawa St
Stonechurch Family Health Centre
Hamilton ON L8W 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1475 Upper Ottawa St
Stonechurch Family Health Centre
Hamilton ON L8W 3J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCK GERARD MERCADO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCADO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCK GERARD MERCADO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCADO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 19 Jul 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021