THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:32:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAZEN EL-BABA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. EL-BABA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. EL-BABA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. EL-BABA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. EL-BABA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. EL-BABA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. EL-BABA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAZEN EL-BABA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. EL-BABA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. EL-BABA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. EL-BABA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. EL-BABA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. EL-BABA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. EL-BABA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021