THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:15:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: Fleury Pazos, Mariela Cristina (Used Until: 21 May 2021)
Medical School: Universidad Central De Venezuela, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa Ontario K8H 3H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 687-7641
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

General Information

Former Name: Fleury Pazos, Mariela Cristina (Used Until: 21 May 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Central De Venezuela, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa Ontario K8H 3H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 687-7641
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIELA CRISTINA FLEURY DE MARQUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLEURY DE MARQUEZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIELA CRISTINA FLEURY DE MARQUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLEURY DE MARQUEZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Central De Venezuela, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021