THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:19:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 194 Court St N
Thunder Bay ON P7A 4V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8073461000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 301 Victoria Ave
Fort Frances ON P9A 2C1
Phone: 8072743287
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Aug 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 194 Court St N
Thunder Bay ON P7A 4V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8073461000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 301 Victoria Ave
Fort Frances ON P9A 2C1
Phone: 8072743287
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Aug 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH PAIGE LATONAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LATONAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH PAIGE LATONAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LATONAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Aug 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2021