THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hopital Monfort
713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101B-745B Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MC BLOUIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Jan 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hopital Monfort
713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101B-745B Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MC BLOUIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Jan 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATHIEU CHARLES BLOUIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOUIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATHIEU CHARLES BLOUIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOUIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 May 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 26 Sep 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2021