THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:06:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Católica de Chile Escuela de Medicina, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-663-3946
Fax: 519-663-3876

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 01 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Católica de Chile Escuela de Medicina, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-663-3946
Fax: 519-663-3876

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 01 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Aug 2022
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 01 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JUAN PABLO ARAB VERDUGO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Gastroenterology, Western University, in which Dr. ARAB VERDUGO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. ARAB VERDUGO no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 August, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2025. Upon renewal of Dr. ARAB VERDUGO's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JUAN PABLO ARAB VERDUGO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Gastroenterology, Western University, in which Dr. ARAB VERDUGO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. ARAB VERDUGO no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 August, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2025. Upon renewal of Dr. ARAB VERDUGO's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Católica de Chile Escuela de Medicina, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025