THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:00:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 666 Wonderland Road North
Teletest Clinic
Unit#3 - Suite#102
London Ontario N6H 4K9
Phone: 519-904-5278
Fax: 1-833-510-0434
Address: 100 Steeles Ave W
Thornhill ON L4J 7Y1
Phone: 2898070596
Fax: 2898070597

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 12 Oct 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia
USA - Massachusetts
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 666 Wonderland Road North
Teletest Clinic
Unit#3 - Suite#102
London Ontario N6H 4K9
Phone: 519-904-5278
Fax: 1-833-510-0434
Address: 100 Steeles Ave W
Thornhill ON L4J 7Y1
Phone: 2898070596
Fax: 2898070597

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 12 Oct 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia
USA - Massachusetts
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Oct 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 14 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALAN KO may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALAN KO may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2023