THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:51:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1530 Birmingham St
IWk health center, 5980 university ave, halifax, Ns, B3K6R8
Department of obstetrics and gynecology
Halifax NS B3J 0B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1530 Birmingham St
1799 robbie street, Halifax, NS, B3H3A7
The halifax infirmary hospital
Halifax NS B3J 0B5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1530 Birmingham St
IWk health center, 5980 university ave, halifax, Ns, B3K6R8
Department of obstetrics and gynecology
Halifax NS B3J 0B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1530 Birmingham St
1799 robbie street, Halifax, NS, B3H3A7
The halifax infirmary hospital
Halifax NS B3J 0B5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULLAH KHALED A AGABAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGABAWI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULLAH KHALED A AGABAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGABAWI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Nov 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Sep 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2021