THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:41:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 640 Ross Avenue East
Suite A1
Timmins Ontario P4N 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7052690415
Fax: 7052690414

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 640 Ross Avenue East
Suite A1
Timmins Ontario P4N 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7052690415
Fax: 7052690414

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LYDIA CHARLOTTE GOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOFF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LYDIA CHARLOTTE GOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOFF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Dec 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Nov 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Oct 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2021