THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:49:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Neurology
08 May 2024 to 02 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
EL - Geriatric Medicine
25 Aug 2021 to 21 Sep 2021
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: EL - Neurology
DATE: 08 May 2024 to 02 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 25 Aug 2021 to 21 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2021