THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:24:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Hematology/Oncology, Dept. of Medicine
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168645389
Fax: 4168643055

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 23 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Hematology/Oncology, Dept. of Medicine
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168645389
Fax: 4168643055

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 23 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISMAIL ABDULRAHMAN I RASLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASLAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISMAIL ABDULRAHMAN I RASLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASLAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2021