THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:45:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1796 Summer St
Division of Cardiology
Room 2132
Halifax NS B3H 3A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1796 Summer St
Division of Cardiology
Room 2132
Halifax NS B3H 3A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUZANNE BOURSALIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURSALIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUZANNE BOURSALIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURSALIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Oct 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Oct 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2023