THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:51:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1650 Av Cedar
Montréal QC H3G 1A4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1650 Av Cedar
Montréal QC H3G 1A4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA ELIZABETH MCDONALD shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MCDONALD is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. MCDONALD shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MCDONALD is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MCDONALD shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MCDONALD is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MCDONALD no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA ELIZABETH MCDONALD shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MCDONALD is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. MCDONALD shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MCDONALD is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MCDONALD shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MCDONALD is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MCDONALD no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
01 Jul 2025 to 14 Jul 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
27 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
01 Jul 2024 to 26 Aug 2024
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
EL - Hematology
14 Feb 2022 to 11 Mar 2022
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 14 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
DATE: 27 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 26 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: EL - Hematology
DATE: 14 Feb 2022 to 11 Mar 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2022