THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:22:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main Street West
McMaster Children's Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main Street West
McMaster Children's Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIA SAFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIA SAFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Dec 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Oct 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2021