THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:23:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2705 Boul Laurier
Québec QC G1V 4G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 699 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2705 Boul Laurier
Québec QC G1V 4G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 699 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE-MARIE BERGERON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BERGERON is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. BERGERON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BERGERON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BERGERON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BERGERON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BERGERON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE-MARIE BERGERON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BERGERON is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. BERGERON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BERGERON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BERGERON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BERGERON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BERGERON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology
15 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology
07 Oct 2024 to 14 Oct 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology
01 Jul 2024 to 06 Oct 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
EL - Gynecologic Oncology
28 Sep 2021 to 25 Oct 2021
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology
DATE: 15 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology
DATE: 07 Oct 2024 to 14 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 06 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Gynecologic Oncology
DATE: 28 Sep 2021 to 25 Oct 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Oct 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2021