THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:14:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Chokecherry Cove
Winnipeg MB R2M 5K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Area Hospital
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Chokecherry Cove
Winnipeg MB R2M 5K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Area Hospital
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEY ANDRE MERCIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEY ANDRE MERCIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2022