THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:48:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
23 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - General Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 22 Sep 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
04 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Apr 2024 to 03 Apr 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Mar 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
11 Apr 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 22 Sep 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 04 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Apr 2024 to 03 Apr 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Nephrology
DATE: 11 Apr 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2022