THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:42:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 28 Oki Dr NW
Alberta Children's Hospital
Pediatrics
Calgary AB T3B 6A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 28 Oki Dr NW
Alberta Children's Hospital
Pediatrics
Calgary AB T3B 6A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIELLE ALEXANDRA CRAM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CRAM is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CRAM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CRAM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CRAM shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CRAM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CRAM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIELLE ALEXANDRA CRAM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CRAM is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CRAM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CRAM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CRAM shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CRAM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CRAM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
EL - Adolescent Medicine
01 Aug 2022 to 28 Aug 2022
McMaster University
EL - Adolescent Medicine
17 Jan 2022 to 13 Feb 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Adolescent Medicine
DATE: 01 Aug 2022 to 28 Aug 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Adolescent Medicine
DATE: 17 Jan 2022 to 13 Feb 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2022