THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 11:59:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shahid Beheshti University of Medical Sciences Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A2-146 Lakeshore Road West
Oak Lake Medical Centre
Oakville Ontario L6K 1E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-837-4747
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1100 Burloak Drive, Ste 300
TeleCBT
Burlington Ontario L7L 6B2
Phone: 4167779933
Fax: 1.289.203.1178

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Shahid Beheshti University of Medical Sciences Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A2-146 Lakeshore Road West
Oak Lake Medical Centre
Oakville Ontario L6K 1E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-837-4747
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1100 Burloak Drive, Ste 300
TeleCBT
Burlington Ontario L7L 6B2
Phone: 4167779933
Fax: 1.289.203.1178

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELHAM ELLIE MIRCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRCHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELHAM ELLIE MIRCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRCHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shahid Beheshti University of Medical Sciences Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 23 Jul 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2021