THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:13:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1403 29 St NW
Foothills Medical Centre
Department of general surgery
Calgary AB T2N 2T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare centre
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 25 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1403 29 St NW
Foothills Medical Centre
Department of general surgery
Calgary AB T2N 2T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare centre
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 25 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KYOO-YOON CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KYOO-YOON CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Mar 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2021