THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:48:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C01a-310 Bridge St W
Thomas Street Clinic
Napanee ON K7R 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-354-2858
Fax: 613-354-6495
Address: PO Box 603 Stn Main
Providence Care Hospital
Hospitalist Medicine
Lakeview 1
Kingston ON K7L 4X3
Phone: 613-544-4900
Extension: 71618
Fax: 613-544-3861
Address: 8 Richmond Park Dr
LACGH
Hospitalist Medicine
Napanee ON K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Extension: 811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600 Abenaki Rd
Colchester East Hants Health Centre
North Nova Medical Eduction
E2-817
Truro NS B2N 5A1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C01a-310 Bridge St W
Thomas Street Clinic
Napanee ON K7R 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-354-2858
Fax: 613-354-6495
Address: PO Box 603 Stn Main
Providence Care Hospital
Hospitalist Medicine
Lakeview 1
Kingston ON K7L 4X3
Phone: 613-544-4900
Extension: 71618
Fax: 613-544-3861
Address: 8 Richmond Park Dr
LACGH
Hospitalist Medicine
Napanee ON K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Extension: 811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600 Abenaki Rd
Colchester East Hants Health Centre
North Nova Medical Eduction
E2-817
Truro NS B2N 5A1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDAN DAVID BOUDREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUDREAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDAN DAVID BOUDREAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUDREAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Apr 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2022