THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:45:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: Jiang, Xue Yao (Used Until: 09 Jan 2022)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Jiang, Xue Yao (Used Until: 09 Jan 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
07 Apr 2025 to 04 May 2025
University of Toronto
EL - Gastroenterology
11 Apr 2022 to 08 May 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
DATE: 07 Apr 2025 to 04 May 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Gastroenterology
DATE: 11 Apr 2022 to 08 May 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 May 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 May 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 May 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 May 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2022