THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:47:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Neurology
A-wing, 4th floor, room A 419
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Neurology
A-wing, 4th floor, room A 419
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA CRISTINA SUTEANU shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SUTEANU is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. SUTEANU shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SUTEANU is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SUTEANU shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SUTEANU is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SUTEANU no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA CRISTINA SUTEANU shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SUTEANU is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. SUTEANU shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SUTEANU is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SUTEANU shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SUTEANU is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SUTEANU no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2025 to 27 Aug 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
28 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
EL - Neurology
22 Nov 2021 to 19 Dec 2021
University of Toronto
EL - Neurology
25 Oct 2021 to 21 Nov 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 27 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 28 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Neurology
DATE: 22 Nov 2021 to 19 Dec 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Neurology
DATE: 25 Oct 2021 to 21 Nov 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Dec 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2021