THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:40:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Nacional San Luis Gonzaga de Ica Facultad de Medicina Humana Dr. Daniel Alcides Carrión, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339-291 Windermere Rd
University Hospital
Neurology/Clinical Neurological Sciences/-
Basement A
London ON N6G 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad Nacional San Luis Gonzaga de Ica Facultad de Medicina Humana Dr. Daniel Alcides Carrión, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339-291 Windermere Rd
University Hospital
Neurology/Clinical Neurological Sciences/-
Basement A
London ON N6G 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. POUL HENRY ESPINO ALVARADO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ESPINO ALVARADO is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. ESPINO ALVARADO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ESPINO ALVARADO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ESPINO ALVARADO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ESPINO ALVARADO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ESPINO ALVARADO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. POUL HENRY ESPINO ALVARADO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ESPINO ALVARADO is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. ESPINO ALVARADO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ESPINO ALVARADO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ESPINO ALVARADO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ESPINO ALVARADO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ESPINO ALVARADO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Nacional San Luis Gonzaga de Ica Facultad de Medicina Humana Dr. Daniel Alcides Carrión, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Dec 2023
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jan 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2022 to 31 Dec 2022
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
27 Mar 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PEAP - CF - Neurology
01 Jan 2022 to 26 Mar 2022
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
Other - Neurology
01 Jul 2021 to 31 Dec 2021
Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Dec 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jan 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Dec 2022
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 27 Mar 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jan 2022 to 26 Mar 2022
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: Other - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Dec 2021
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2022