THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:41:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics
01 Jan 2023 to 17 Mar 2023
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics
02 Jun 2022 to 31 Dec 2022
Western University
PEAP - CF - Pediatrics
09 Mar 2022 to 01 Jun 2022
Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jan 2023 to 17 Mar 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics
DATE: 02 Jun 2022 to 31 Dec 2022
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatrics
DATE: 09 Mar 2022 to 01 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Mar 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2022