THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:32:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Birmingham College of Medical and Dental Sciences, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Birmingham College of Medical and Dental Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Birmingham College of Medical and Dental Sciences, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 31 Jul 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
23 Apr 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Feb 2022 to 22 Apr 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Jul 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 23 Apr 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Feb 2022 to 22 Apr 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2022