THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:20:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: NUI Galway School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 486 Front Street West
Unit 14
Toronto Ontario M5V 0V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 925-6005
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bermuda
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: NUI Galway School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 486 Front Street West
Unit 14
Toronto Ontario M5V 0V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 925-6005
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bermuda
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHDIS RIAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIAZI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHDIS RIAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIAZI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: NUI Galway School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2022