THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:37:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 University Avenue
7NU Toronto General Hospital
7th Floor, Room 718A
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4609
Fax: 416-340-3750

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 03 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 University Avenue
7NU Toronto General Hospital
7th Floor, Room 718A
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4609
Fax: 416-340-3750

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 03 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JIAN ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JIAN ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2023