THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:03:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Western University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1600 8th Street East
Brightshores Hospital - Owen Sound
General Surgery
Room 7203
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 1M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-256-1177
Fax: 226-256-1176

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Western University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1600 8th Street East
Brightshores Hospital - Owen Sound
General Surgery
Room 7203
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 1M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-256-1177
Fax: 226-256-1176

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC MCCLEARY HEMPEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEMPEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC MCCLEARY HEMPEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEMPEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Western University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 May 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Apr 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 May 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2022