THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:45:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Government Medical College Nagpur, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Feb 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 04 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Government Medical College Nagpur, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Feb 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 04 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
04 Feb 2022
03 Feb 2029
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 04 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Feb 03 2029
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. GAYATRI SARAF may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, Division of Medicine, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. SARAF holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SARAF no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. SARAF’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. SARAF’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 04 February, 2022. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on February 3, 2029.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. GAYATRI SARAF may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, Division of Medicine, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. SARAF holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SARAF no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. SARAF’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. SARAF’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 04 February, 2022. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on February 3, 2029.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Government Medical College Nagpur, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 03 Feb 2029
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 03 Feb 2029

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2022