THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:56:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Taibah University College of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Taibah University College of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Taibah University College of Medicine, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology
01 Oct 2024 to 20 Oct 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology
01 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology
04 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - General Pathology
07 Jul 2022 to 03 Aug 2022
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology
DATE: 01 Oct 2024 to 20 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology
DATE: 01 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Pathology
DATE: 04 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - General Pathology
DATE: 07 Jul 2022 to 03 Aug 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2022