THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:05:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-300 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2896061333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-300 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2896061333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEN ANTOUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTOUN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEN ANTOUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTOUN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Mar 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2022