THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:04:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road
The Ottawa Hospital – General Campus
Room L1245
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8899
Extension: 73994
Fax: 613-737-8537
Address: 70 Exhibition Street
Suite 125
Kentville Nova Scotia B4N 4K9
Phone: 902-365-3565
Fax: 902-417-1283

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 25 Aug 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road
The Ottawa Hospital – General Campus
Room L1245
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8899
Extension: 73994
Fax: 613-737-8537
Address: 70 Exhibition Street
Suite 125
Kentville Nova Scotia B4N 4K9
Phone: 902-365-3565
Fax: 902-417-1283

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 25 Aug 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW LEWIS NUNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUNN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW LEWIS NUNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUNN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2022